Rice v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elaine Rice
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv00371
Filed: February 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Matthew W. Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' 279 motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendants' answer to the complaint is due no later than 3/31/2021. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/10/2021. (jr)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 250 Plaintiffs' motion for partial reconsideration is granted in part and denied in part; The Court reconsiders 248 its January 15, 2020 decision to di smiss with prejudice Plaintiffs' Erika Mendoza and James Hunts First and Second Causes of Action; Plaintiffs may file their amended complaint by August 27, 2020; The Court reconsiders 248 its January 15, 2020 decision to dismiss with prejudic e Plaintiffs' Erika Mendoza and James Hunts three Causes of Action as asserted against Defendant Midea Microwave and Electrical Appliances Manufactured Company, Limited and against Defendant Sharp Appliances Thailand Limited; These claims ar e reinstated for the purpose of retransfer; Mendoza and Hunts entire Action is retransferred to the Eastern District of California; The Court reconsiders 248 its January 15, 2020 decision to dismiss with prejudice Plaintiff Dean Mauros First Cause of Action as asserted against Defendants Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Lowes Home Centers, LLC; this Cause of Action is reinstated and dismissed without prejudice; all other aspects of relief that Plaintiffs have raised in their Motion for Part ial Reconsideration, or in the alternative, for Interlocutory Appeal are denied; 264 Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b)Seeking Relief From This Courts Final Order Dismissing Plaintiff Rice's Tort-Base d Claims With Prejudice is denied; 248 the Court's January 15, 2020 Order is VACATED to the extent that it is inconsistent with the above; the caption is amended (see order re new caption). (Please see order for further/complete details and deadlines.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/13/2020. (lg)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Sharp America's 206 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; Defendant Sharp Thailand's 208 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; Defendant Midea China' s 209 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; Defendant Midea America's 210 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; and Defendants Electrolux, Lowe's, and Modesto's 211 Partial Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/15/2020. (jr)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 160 Ex Parte Motion to Allow Alternative Service on Defendants Midea Microwave and Electrical Appliances Manufacturing Co., Ltd. and Sharp Appliances Thailand Limited Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (See Order for further/complete details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/15/2018. (jr)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for retransfer to the USDC Eastern District of California or in the alternative to consolidate is granted in part and denied in part; mot ion granted to the extent that it requests the consolidation of this action with Rice/Kukich vs. Electrolux Home Products, Inc. No. 4:15-CV-539 and Mauro vs. Electrolux Home Products, Inc. et al No. 4:18-CV-539; Plaintiffs in the now consolidated act ion are directed to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days; motions to dismiss in all three actions will be denied as moot; Clerk directed to docket Plaintiffs' ex parte motion to allow alternative service (doc 133 in 4:17-CV-2028) and Plaintiff's motion to retransfer (doc 75 in 4:18-CV-539). See order for further/complete details). Signed by Matthew W. Brann on 8/20/18. (lg)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 REDACTED MEMORANDUM dated June 17, 2016. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/28/2018. (jr)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 117 Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to amend their complaint, as indicated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. (See Order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/20/2018. (jr)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER (opinion): no later than 1/31/17 the parties shall refile under seal any pleadings in this or any other case that attach or incorporate the confidential information set forth in dft's supplemental responses to pltf's first set of interrogatories. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/10/17. (lg)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). Dfts motion to strike (doc 8) is granted with leave to amend; Court will sua sponte strike Count Eight with prejudice; dfts motion to dismiss (doc 10) is granted in part and denied in part; plaintiff may, within 21 days, file an amended complaint (see order for complete details). Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/28/15. (lg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Rice
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Represented By: Jason S. Kilene
Represented By: Charles Kocher
Represented By: Sean P. McDonough
Represented By: Paul T. Oven
Represented By: Simon B. Paris
Represented By: Sara Payne
Represented By: Joseph G. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?