Westfield Insurance Company v. Icon Legacy Custom Modular Homes et al
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Defendant: Icon Legacy Custom Modular Homes and Icon Legacy
Case Number: 4:2015cv00539
Filed: March 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Matthew W. Brann
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's 95 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; Defendant's 91 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; and the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and close this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/13/2018. (jr)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants Motion to Compel 60 is DENIED. Defendants Motion for Sanctions 64 is DENIED. The following renewed case management deadlines apply to this case : Discovery due by 5/26/2017 and Dispositive Motions due by 7/10/2017. No further extensions of these case management deadlines will be granted, unless such extensions are made jointly by the parties. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/12/2017. (jn)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re Plaintiff's 31 MOTION to Dismiss; Defendant's 45 MOTION to Continue Case Management Schedule.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/29/16. (km)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). Defendant Icon Legacy Custom Modular Home's motion to dismiss (ECF Doc 9) is denied without prejudice as to its ability to file a similar action in the future. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/30/15. (lg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfield Insurance Company v. Icon Legacy Custom Modular Homes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: James C. Clark
Represented By: John J. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icon Legacy Custom Modular Homes
Represented By: Jonathan H. Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icon Legacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?