Sheetz et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Sheetz and Richard H. Sheetz, Jr.
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv02210
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Clinton
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 75 First MOTION for Consideration to Declare Patricia Sheetz Unable to Testify at Trial filed by Richard H. Sheetz, Jr., Patricia A. Sheetz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 3/28/2018. (cw)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 94 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Medical Expert, Dr. Ronald E. DiSimone, Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37(c) and F.R.C.P. 37(b)(2)(A) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick on 3/23/2018. (cw)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: In accord with the accompanying Memorandum 88 ; Dft Wal-Mart Stores, East, L.P.s mtn in limine to exclude the testimony of Dr. Ronald DiSimone at trial 72 , is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, Pltfs are directed to produce Dr. DiSimones testimonial history within (14) days from the date of this Order.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/22/17. (ma)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheetz et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Sheetz
Represented By: Lee H. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard H. Sheetz, Jr.
Represented By: Lee H. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Candace N. Edgar
Represented By: Mark R. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Represented By: Candace N. Edgar
Represented By: Mark R. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?