Ziemer v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Shauna Ziemer
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Clinton Township, Griffith Company and Estate of Howard E. Martin, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2016cv01001
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Matthew W. Brann
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Estate of Howard E. Martin Jr.s 75 Motion for SummaryJudgment is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Estate of Howard E. Martin, Jr. in his capacities as both Defendant and Cross-Defendant. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/1/2018. (jr)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 105 Second MOTION to Intervene filed by Old Republic Insurance Co. is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/8/2018. (jr)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant Griffith Company's Motion for Summary Judgment 63 is GRANTED. All claims and cross claims asserted against Griffith Company are hereby dismissed with prejudice from the above captioned matter. Defendant Griffith Company's Motion to Dismiss 55 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/1/2017. (jn)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry); granting defendant Griffith Company's motion to dismiss; plaintiff is given 21 days from the date of this order to amend Counts Five and Six of her complaint. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/15/16. (lg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziemer v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauna Ziemer
Represented By: Bernard F. Cantorna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Township
Represented By: David J. MacMain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffith Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Howard E. Martin, Jr.
Represented By: Gary L. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?