SLOANE v. GULF INTERSTATE FIELD SERVICES, INC
Plaintiff: Thomas Sloane
Defendant: Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc
Case Number: 4:2016cv01571
Filed: July 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Matthew W. Brann
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's 210 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and Defendant's 216 Motion to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Thomas Sloane is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/26/2018. (jr)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending 204 is DENIED. The case management deadlines set forth in this Court's 3/24/2017 Order 193 , remain in FULL FORCE AND EFFECT. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/7/2017. (jn)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Against Non-Party Subpoenas 198 is GRANTED. The contested subpoenas are deemed WITHDRAWN. No later than 5/15/2017, counsel for Plaintiff shall formally notify each subpoena recipient of this Order and of the subpoenas' withdrawal. The case management deadlines set forth by this Court's 3/24/2017 Order 193 , remain in FULL FORCE AND EFFECT. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/12/2017. (jn)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiffs Motion to Facilitate Notice and for Certification of a Nationwide Collective Action 141 , pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b), is DENIED. The opt-in Plaintiffs are DISMISSED. Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23, 142 , is DENIED. Discovery deadline is reset to 5/19/2017. Dispositive Motions deadline is reset to 7/18/2017. The remaining case management deadlines will be set, if necessary, after the Court resolves the parties dispositive motions. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/24/2017. (jn)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER indicating that upon consideration of Plaintiff Thomas Sloane's "Emergency Motion to Stay Transfer Order and Motion to Correct" 138 , it is hereby ordered that, for reasons more fully stated in said Order, said Motion 138 is denied. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/28/16. (jg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 7/29/2016.]
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within, the Court finds that Sloane has failed to show cause why this matter that his attorneys erroneously filed in this District should not be transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). An appropriate Order follows transferring this matter to the Williamsport Division of that District, forthwith. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/27/16. (jg)[Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 7/29/2016.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SLOANE v. GULF INTERSTATE FIELD SERVICES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Sloane
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Represented By: Shanon J Carson
Represented By: James A Jones
Represented By: Alexandra Koropey Piazza
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc
Represented By: Peter N. Hall
Represented By: Annette A. Idalski
Represented By: Veronica Turner Saltz
Represented By: Keith E. Whitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?