MCCALL et al v. AVCO CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: Wanchart Mccall and Deborah Mccall
Defendant: Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines and Avco Lycoming-Textron Williamsport
Case Number: 4:2018cv01350
Filed: July 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2018 Filing 9 Case transferred in electronically from District of Pennsylvania Eastern District; Case Number 2:18-cv-02637 containing electronic documents (lg)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER-MEMORANDUM: THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE THIS CASE IN THIS DISTRICT. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/6/18. 7/6/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/6/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 7 Response to Order to Show Cause by AVCO CORPORATION, AVCO LYCOMING-TEXTRON WILLIAMSPORT, LYCOMING ENGINES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2) (SOLOMON, ELAINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/6/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by DEBORAH MCCALL, WANCHART MCCALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R-1, #19 Exhibit R-2, #20 Exhibit R-3, #21 Exhibit R-4, #22 Exhibit R-5, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U, #26 Exhibit V, #27 Exhibit W, #28 Exhibit X, #29 Exhibit Y, #30 Exhibit Z, #31 Exhibit AA)(MISKA, MICHAEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/6/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by AVCO CORPORATION, AVCO LYCOMING-TEXTRON WILLIAMSPORT, LYCOMING ENGINES.(SOLOMON, ELAINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/6/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT BOTH PARTIES SHALL SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING 10 PAGES FILED NO LATER THAN 7/2/98 AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT TRANSFER TO THE USDC FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT OF DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF RHODE ISLAND OR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA UNDER && 1404 (a) OR 1406; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/25/18. 6/25/18 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/6/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ETHAN SIMON on behalf of AVCO CORPORATION, LYCOMING ENGINES, AVCO LYCOMING-TEXTRON WILLIAMSPORT. (SIMON, ETHAN) Modified on 6/26/2018 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/6/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TEXTRON INC. for AVCO CORPORATION, AVCO LYCOMING-TEXTRON WILLIAMSPORT, LYCOMING ENGINES. with Certificate of Service(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/6/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by AVCO CORPORATION, AVCO LYCOMING-TEXTRON WILLIAMSPORT and LYCOMING ENGINES from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 170303050. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ppe180315) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track, #3 Designation Form)(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/6/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCALL et al v. AVCO CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avco Corporation
Represented By: Elaine D. Solomon
Represented By: Ethan Simon
Represented By: Patrick G. Spaugh
Represented By: Elizabeth M. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycoming Engines
Represented By: Elaine D. Solomon
Represented By: Patrick G. Spaugh
Represented By: Elizabeth M. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avco Lycoming-Textron Williamsport
Represented By: Elaine D. Solomon
Represented By: Patrick G. Spaugh
Represented By: Elizabeth M. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanchart Mccall
Represented By: Michael S. Miska
Represented By: Michael S Miska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Mccall
Represented By: Michael S. Miska
Represented By: Michael S Miska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?