Rumsey v. The Guthrie Clinic et al
Plaintiff: Richard Rumsey
Defendant: The Guthrie Clinic, Guthrie Medical Group, P.C. and Guthrie Robert Packer Hospital
Case Number: 4:2018cv01605
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Guthrie Medical Group, P.C., Guthrie Robert Packer Hospital, The Guthrie Clinic.(Pugh, Robert)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants may file an answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint until and including 10/5/2018. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/27/2018. (jr)
September 26, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #13 Amended Complaint by Guthrie Medical Group, P.C., Guthrie Robert Packer Hospital, The Guthrie Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Pugh, Robert)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' #12 Motion for More Definite Statement and to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/18/2018. (jr)
September 12, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Guthrie Medical Group, P.C., Guthrie Robert Packer Hospital, The Guthrie Clinic, filed by Richard Rumsey.(Fallon, Christopher)
September 12, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Pugh is instructed to file the brief in support of the Motion for More Definite Statement as a separate document using the civil event "brief in support". (lg)
September 11, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for More Definite Statement and to Dismiss by Guthrie Medical Group, P.C., Guthrie Robert Packer Hospital, The Guthrie Clinic. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Pugh, Robert)
September 6, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Guthrie Medical Group on August 21, 2018, filed by Richard Rumsey. (Fallon, Christopher)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Guthrie Robert Packer on August 21, 2018, filed by Richard Rumsey. (Fallon, Christopher)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The Guthrie Clinic on August 21, 2018, filed by Richard Rumsey. (Fallon, Christopher)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Robert C. Pugh. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/29/18. (lg)
August 29, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: verified PA bar record of Attorney Robert Pugh; verified Attorney Paul C. Troy is generally admitted to the Middle District of PA and is eligible to be associate counsel as listed on the petition for admission. (lg)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Guthrie Medical Group, P.C., Guthrie Robert Packer Hospital, The Guthrie Clinic. (Pugh, Robert)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Connell Pugh on behalf of All Defendants. (Pugh, Robert)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Robert Connell Pugh on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Robert Pugh is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4529249.. (Pugh, Robert)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/21/2018. (jr)
August 15, 2018 Receipt of payment from COZEN OCONNOR in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 8/14/2018. Receipt number 333061893 processed by lhannick. (jjs, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATES of Merit as to defendants, filed by Richard Rumsey. (lg)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 333061893), filed by Richard Rumsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rumsey v. The Guthrie Clinic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guthrie Clinic
Represented By: Paul C. Troy
Represented By: Robert Connell Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guthrie Medical Group, P.C.
Represented By: Paul C. Troy
Represented By: Robert Connell Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guthrie Robert Packer Hospital
Represented By: Paul C. Troy
Represented By: Robert Connell Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rumsey
Represented By: Christopher C Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?