United States of America v. Oberdorf

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Max A. Oberdorf
Case Number: 4:2018cv01797
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42:1471
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Max A. Oberdorf served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Solarz, Rebecca)
September 14, 2018 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/14/2018. (jr)
September 12, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Max A. Oberdorf and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
September 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Max A. Oberdorf, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Oberdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max A. Oberdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Solarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?