Sheffer v. Centre County et al
Plaintiff: Matthew John Sheffer
Defendant: Pamela A. Ruest, Brian K. Marshall, Thomas Jordan, Crystal Hundt, Jeffery Ebeck, Centre County, Katherine V. Oliver, Stephanie L. Cooper, Carmine W. Prestia and Thomas King Kistler
Case Number: 4:2018cv02080
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Referring Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffery Ebeck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Docket, #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Neary, Keli)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Crystal Hundt. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance Word Count)(Mix, Robert)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Crystal Hundt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mix, Robert)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Centre County.(Mix, Robert)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Centre County. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mix, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Sulcove on behalf of Jeffery Ebeck (Sulcove, Lauren)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Thomas Jordan, Thomas King Kistler, Brian K. Marshall, Katherine V. Oliver, Carmine W. Prestia, Pamela A. Ruest.(Krandel, Robert)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Thomas Jordan, Thomas King Kistler, Brian K. Marshall, Katherine V. Oliver, Carmine W. Prestia, Pamela A. Ruest. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Krandel, Robert)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jeffery Ebeck. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence Certifcate of Concurrence/Non-concurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Neary, Keli)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Krandel on behalf of Thomas Jordan, Thomas King Kistler, Brian K. Marshall, Katherine V. Oliver, Carmine W. Prestia, Pamela A. Ruest (Krandel, Robert)
October 26, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case assigned to Judge Brann and referred to Magistrate Judge Mehalchick. (lh)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (lg)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeffery Ebeck from Centre County Court, case number 2018-CV-2276. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4580641), filed by Jeffery Ebeck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheffer v. Centre County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela A. Ruest
Represented By: Robert J Krandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian K. Marshall
Represented By: Robert J Krandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Jordan
Represented By: Robert J Krandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Hundt
Represented By: Robert Allen Mix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Ebeck
Represented By: Keli M. Neary
Represented By: Lauren E. Sulcove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centre County
Represented By: Robert Allen Mix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine V. Oliver
Represented By: Robert J Krandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmine W. Prestia
Represented By: Robert J Krandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas King Kistler
Represented By: Robert J Krandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew John Sheffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?