Bower v. United States Department of Labor

Plaintiff: Stephen Bower
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Case Number: 4:2018cv02180
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 United States Department of Labor answer due 1/15/2019. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/20/2018. (jr)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due on or before 1/15/2019. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/20/2018. (jr)
December 17, 2018 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Simpson, D.)
November 30, 2018 6 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Anderson Scott. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/30/18. (lg)
November 29, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: verified Georgia bar record of Attorney Anderson Scott. (lg)
November 29, 2018 5 Supplement by Stephen Bower. to Docket Annotation, #4 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice, . (Scott, Anderson)
November 29, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Scott is instructed to file page 3 of the petition for special admission indicating name and address of associate counsel (associate counsel can be Attorney Steele or any attorney who has been generally admitted to this Court), using the civil event "supplement"; do not refile the petition as another fee will be charged. (lg)
November 28, 2018 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Anderson B. Scott on behalf of Stephen Bower Attorney Anderson Scott is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4610604., filed by on behalf of Stephen Bower.(Scott, Anderson)
November 13, 2018 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM emailed to Attorney Anderson B. Scott (lg)
November 9, 2018 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/9/2018. (jr)
November 9, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Labor and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ch1)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Labor ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4596619), filed by Stephen Bower. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter to OSHA, #3 Mailing Addresses)(ch1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bower v. United States Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bower
Represented By: Heather Z. Steele
Represented By: Anderson B. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: D. Brian Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?