Lovley et al v. Susquehanna Bank et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Lovley and Renee Lovley
Defendant: BB&T Mortgage, Susquehanna Bank and Branch Banking and Trust Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00117
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #6 Motion to Remand to State Court is granted; #7 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot; Clerk directed to close this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/12/19 (case closed) (certified copy mailed to Lycoming County Prothonotary) (lg)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(DiVittore, Stephanie)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/28/2019. (jr)
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Renee Lovley, Samuel Lovley. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Citations, #2 Proposed Order)(Carlucci, William)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Renee Lovley, Samuel Lovley.(Carlucci, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(DiVittore, Stephanie)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(DiVittore, Stephanie) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/8/2019) (rw).
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Renee Lovley, Samuel Lovley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carlucci, William)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Motion for Remand re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Renee Lovley, Samuel Lovley.(Carlucci, William)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(DiVittore, Stephanie)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Renee Lovley, Samuel Lovley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit(s) Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit(s) Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit(s) Exhibit M)(Carlucci, William)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.)Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/22/2019. (jr)
January 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Tribeck on behalf of Branch Banking and Trust Company (Tribeck, Robert)
January 21, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (DiVittore, Stephanie)
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie E. DiVittore on behalf of Branch Banking and Trust Company (DiVittore, Stephanie)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Branch Banking and Trust Company from Lycoming County Court of Common Pleas, case number 15-2852. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4652309), filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovley et al v. Susquehanna Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB&T Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susquehanna Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Stephanie E. DiVittore
Represented By: Robert J. Tribeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Lovley
Represented By: William P. Carlucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Lovley
Represented By: William P. Carlucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?