VanHousen v. Robert Packer Hospital et al

Plaintiff: Darleen VanHousen
Defendant: Guthrie Medical Group, P.C., Russell Rees, M.D. and Robert Packer Hospital
Case Number: 4:2019cv00834
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 7/23/2019 at 1:30 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/24/2019. (jr)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Guthrie Medical Group, P.C., Russell Rees, M.D., Robert Packer Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Montoro, Mary)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Russell Rees, on May 28, 2019, filed by Darleen VanHousen. (Fallon, Christopher)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Darleen VanHousen.(Fallon, Christopher)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of of Merit by Darleen VanHousen . (Fallon, Christopher)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Guthrie Medical Group, P.C., Russell Rees, M.D., Robert Packer Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Montoro, Mary)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M. Montoro on behalf of All Defendants (Montoro, Mary)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Perry on behalf of All Defendants (Perry, Mark)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/20/2019. (jr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of of Merit as to Defendant Russell Rees, M.D. by Darleen VanHousen . (Fallon, Christopher)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of of Merit as to Defendant Robert Packer Hospital by Darleen VanHousen . (Fallon, Christopher)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Merit as to Defendant Guthrie Medical Group, P.C. by Darleen VanHousen . (Fallon, Christopher)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Guthrie Medical Group, P.C., Russell Rees, M.D., Robert Packer Hospital and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guthrie Medical Group, P.C., Russell Rees, M.D., Robert Packer Hospital ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4760393), filed by Darleen VanHousen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VanHousen v. Robert Packer Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guthrie Medical Group, P.C.
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Represented By: Mark T. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Rees, M.D.
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Represented By: Mark T. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Packer Hospital
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Represented By: Mark T. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darleen VanHousen
Represented By: Christopher C Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?