Swede vs. Wood Mode
Plaintiff: William Swede
Defendant: Wood-Mode
Case Number: 4:2019cv00845
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Wood-Mode Incorporated's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint for Violation of WARN Act 29 U.S.C. Section 2101, Et Seq. by Wood-Mode. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(Francella, Thomas)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Swede. Wood-Mode served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Cordes, Samuel)
June 27, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Cordes is instructed to file proof of service (i.e., the certified return receipt green card or post office confirmation of delivery) upon the defendant using the civil event "service of process" >>> "summons returned executed" which will then calculate the answer deadline. (lg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William Swede re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, (Cordes, Samuel)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/20/2019. (jr)
May 16, 2019 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM AND ECF REGISTRATION FORMS SENT to Attorney Raisner and Attorney Roupinian (lg)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wood-Mode and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Wood-Mode, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4760958 ), filed by William Swede. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg) Modified on 5/16/2019 (lg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swede vs. Wood Mode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood-Mode
Represented By: Thomas J Francella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Swede
Represented By: Jack A. Raisner
Represented By: Rene' S. Roupinian
Represented By: Samuel J. Cordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?