Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 4:2019cv01048
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/18/2019. (jr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Malibu Media, LLC re #6 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(Fiore, Christopher)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fiore, Christopher)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Malibu Media, LLC. (Fiore, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/21/2019. (jr)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 Report on the filing of copyright action. (nr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (nr).
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Doe and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4792994), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Christopher P. Fiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?