Ragan v. Glenn O. Hawbaker Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Ragan
Defendant: Glenn O. Hawbaker Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company and Guthrie Clinic
Case Number: 4:2019cv01092
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the clerk is directed to CLOSE this caseadministratively, and the parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within 60 days upon consummation of this settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 8, 2019. (kjn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Patricia A. Lee regarding settlement . (Lee, Patricia)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey Ragan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(nr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to the court from Jeffrey Ragan. (nr)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Glenn O. Hawbaker Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Patricia)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1. Proceedings on the motion to dismiss are STAYED until August 23, 2019. 2. In the meanwhile, if possible, the parties are directed to attempt to mediate this dispute by exchanging offers and demands. 3. On or before August 7, 2019, the parties will notify the courtregarding whether: (1) mediation has been successful; (2) the parties jointly request the assistance of a court-appointed mediator; or (3) mediation has beenunsuccessful and the court should address the pending motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on July 24, 2019. (kjn)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey Ragan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(nr)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . The plaintiff is directed to respond to this motion to dismiss on or before August 2, 2019. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.7 the movants may then file reply briefs on or before August 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on July 18, 2019. (kjn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Aetna Life Insurance Company, Glenn O. Hawbaker Inc., Guthrie Clinic, Jeffrey Ragan YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 8/2/2019 (kjn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Glenn O. Hawbaker Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Dismiss Brief, #2 Joann Conejo Certification in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit(s) A to Joann Conejo Certification in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Patricia)
July 2, 2019 Receipt of payment from CONNELL FOLEY in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 7/1/2019. Receipt number 333066446 processed by epetrosk. (tp)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 333066446. Complaint is now deemed FILED. (bg)
June 26, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Lee is instructed to update firm address/phone number using the "Utilities" tab of ECF, then "Your Account". (lg)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation. (lg)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Glenn O. Hawbaker Inc. (no corporate parent). (lg)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Glenn O. Hawbaker Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company from Commonwealth of PA Mag District Court, case number MJ-42301-CV-0000132-2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid/check #1149 to Scranton for receipt processing), filed by Glenn O. Hawbaker Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragan v. Glenn O. Hawbaker Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Ragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn O. Hawbaker Inc.
Represented By: Patricia A. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patricia A. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guthrie Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?