Grages et al v. Geisinger Health et al
Plaintiff: Jane Emilia Grages and Mark James Donovan
Defendant: Geisinger Health, Jaewon Ryu, David Feinburg, Geisinger Medical Center, Jennifer Roy and Susan M. Baro
Case Number: 4:2019cv01141
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF MERIT filed by Jane Emilia Grages and Mark James Donovan (lg)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Susan M. Baro, David Feinburg, Geisinger Health, Geisinger Medical Center, Jennifer Roy, Jaewon Ryu re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #16 Brief in Support (Sheridan, Cindy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Susan M. Baro, David Feinburg, Geisinger Health, Geisinger Medical Center, Jennifer Roy, Jaewon Ryu.(Sheridan, Cindy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Susan M. Baro, David Feinburg, Geisinger Health, Geisinger Medical Center, Jennifer Roy, Jaewon Ryu.(Sheridan, Cindy)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Emilia Grages. David Feinburg served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (lg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Defendants YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 9/11/2019 (ms)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Mark James Donovan YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 9/11/2019 (ms)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Jane Emilia Grages YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 9/11/2019 (ms)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Susan M. Baro, David Feinburg, Geisinger Health, Geisinger Medical Center, Jennifer Roy, Jaewon Ryu re #9 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance (Sheridan, Cindy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy A. Sheridan on behalf of Susan M. Baro, David Feinburg, Geisinger Health, Geisinger Medical Center, Jennifer Roy, Jaewon Ryu. (Sheridan, Cindy)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Emilia Grages. Susan M. Baro, Geisinger Health, Jennifer Roy, Jaewon Ryu served on 7/19/2019, answers due 8/9/2019. (lg)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, envelope states "RTS". Mail sent to Mark James Donovan. (nr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Doc. #2 "Return to Sender" Mail sent to Mark James Donovan (ga)
July 10, 2019 Receipt of payment from JANE GRAGES in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 7/9/2019. Receipt number 333066591 processed by epetrosk. (jjs, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 333066591. Complaint is now deemed FILED. (ga)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO pro se plaintiff VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 order)(lg)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (lg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark James Donovan, Jane Emilia Grages, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grages et al v. Geisinger Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Health
Represented By: Cindy A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaewon Ryu
Represented By: Cindy A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Feinburg
Represented By: Cindy A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Medical Center
Represented By: Cindy A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Roy
Represented By: Cindy A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. Baro
Represented By: Cindy A. Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Emilia Grages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark James Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?