Berkley Specialty Insurance Company v. Masterforce Construction Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Berkley Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: We Do Metal Roofs, Karen Brandt, Robert Deharder, O.D. John P. Brandt and Keith R. Wilton
Counter Plaintiff: Masterforce Construction Corp.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01162
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessalyn Lee Cool on behalf of John P. Brandt, Karen Brandt (Cool, Jessalyn)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by John P. Brandt, Karen Brandt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Englert, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Berkley Specialty Insurance Company by Masterforce Construction Corp..(Berger, Phillip)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip D. Berger on behalf of Masterforce Construction Corp. (Berger, Phillip)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Berkley Specialty Insurance Company. Karen Brandt waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Miscioscia, Anthony)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Berkley Specialty Insurance Company. John P. Brandt waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Miscioscia, Anthony)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/15/2019. (jr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4808409), filed by Berkley Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkley Specialty Insurance Company v. Masterforce Construction Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: We Do Metal Roofs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Brandt
Represented By: Jessalyn Lee Cool
Represented By: Robert F. Englert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Deharder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.D. John P. Brandt
Represented By: Jessalyn Lee Cool
Represented By: Robert F. Englert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith R. Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Masterforce Construction Corp.
Represented By: Phillip D. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Konrad R. Krebs
Represented By: Anthony L. Miscioscia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?