Freid v. Summit BHC Westfield
Plaintiff: Lindsay Freid
Defendant: Summit BHC Westfield
Case Number: 4:2019cv01450
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Summit BHC Westfield.(Ninosky, John)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant is ordered to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) on or before 9/26/2019. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/18/2019. (jr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Summit BHC Westfield. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence)(Ninosky, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Ninosky on behalf of Summit BHC Westfield (Ninosky, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/11/2019. (jr)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lindsay Freid. Summit BHC Westfield served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Christopher, Daryl)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Summit BHC Westfield and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Summit BHC Westfield LLC d/b/a Mountain Laurel Recovery Center ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4849255), filed by Lindsay Freid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freid v. Summit BHC Westfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Freid
Represented By: Daryl E. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit BHC Westfield
Represented By: John R. Ninosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?