Wolff v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joanne Wolff
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company and The Rawlings Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01596
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company, The Rawlings Company, filed by Joanne Wolff.(Kannebecker, Charles)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 APPENDIX by Aetna Life Insurance Company, The Rawlings Company. to #8 Brief in Support, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,with Unreported Cases. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14, #15 Exhibit(s) 15, #16 Exhibit(s) 16, #17 Exhibit(s) 17)(Venditta, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, The Rawlings Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Counsel Regarding Brief Word Count)(Venditta, Elizabeth)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Aetna Life Insurance Company, The Rawlings Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Venditta, Elizabeth)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order approving #4 Stipulation. The defendant shall have until 10/23/2019 to answer, plead or otherwise move as to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Plaintiffs shall have until 11/23/2019 to answer or move to Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint; Defendants shall have 14 days to Reply to Plaintiff's answer; and Plaintiffs shall have 14 days to answer Defendants' Reply. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/23/2019. (jr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/19/2019. (jr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Aetna Life Insurance Company, The Rawlings Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Venditta, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Rawlings Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Venditta, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Venditta, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life Insurance Company and The Rawlings Company, from Lycomig County Court, case number 19-1308. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4872589), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolff v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Venditta
Represented By: David J. Creagan
Represented By: Timothy A Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rawlings Company
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Venditta
Represented By: David J. Creagan
Represented By: Timothy A Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Wolff
Represented By: Charles Kannebecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?