Bradley v. S.C. Boys, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Bradley
Defendant: Thomas Walker, S.C. Boys, Inc. and Scott Luccesi
Case Number: 4:2020cv00262
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order approving #15 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants shall have until 5/12/2020 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/3/2020. (jr)
April 3, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Mortensen is instructed to file a separate form of order for Judge Brann's signature/approval re stipulation to extend time to answer using the civil event > other filings > other documents > SUPPLEMENT; Please do not refile the stipulation. (lg)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Scott Luccesi, S.C. Boys, Inc., Thomas Walker. (Mortensen, Philip)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice N Ross on behalf of All Defendants (Ross, Maurice)
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip S Mortensen on behalf of All Defendants (Mortensen, Philip)
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Maurice N. Ross. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/18/2020. (lg)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Philip S. Mortensen. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/18/2020. (lg)
March 18, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: verified New York bar record of Attorney Mortensen and Attorney Ross. NOTE: ECF registration form sent to Attorney Ross. All participating attorneys are to be registered E-filers unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption. (lg)
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Philip S Mortensen on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Maurice N. Ross is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5035509.. (Mortensen, Philip)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Philip S Mortensen on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Philip S. Mortensen is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5035500.. (Mortensen, Philip)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R Olcese on behalf of Joshua Bradley (Olcese, Andrew)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S Seiler on behalf of Joshua Bradley (Seiler, Timothy)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Joshua Bradley. Scott Luccesi waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020; S.C. Boys, Inc. waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020; Thomas Walker waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Karpf, Ari)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip K Miles, III on behalf of All Defendants (Miles, Philip)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Snyder on behalf of Scott Luccesi, S.C. Boys, Inc., Thomas Walker (Snyder, John)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/14/2020. (jr)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Scott Luccesi, S.C. Boys, Inc., Thomas Walker and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Luccesi, S.C. Boys, Inc., Thomas Walker ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5008925), filed by Joshua Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. S.C. Boys, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Bradley
Represented By: Ari R. Karpf
Represented By: Andrew R Olcese
Represented By: Timothy S Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Walker
Represented By: Maurice N Ross
Represented By: Philip S Mortensen
Represented By: Philip K Miles, III
Represented By: John A. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.C. Boys, Inc.
Represented By: Maurice N Ross
Represented By: Philip S Mortensen
Represented By: Philip K Miles, III
Represented By: John A. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Luccesi
Represented By: Maurice N Ross
Represented By: Philip S Mortensen
Represented By: Philip K Miles, III
Represented By: John A. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?