Williams v. Pennsylvania State University et al
Plaintiff: Kayla Williams
Defendant: Pennsylvania State University, Michelle Yarwood, Brendan Prawdzik and Karen Feldbaum
Case Number: 4:2020cv00298
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Kayla Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berardinelli, Nelson)
April 6, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Karen Feldbaum, Pennsylvania State University, Brendan Prawdzik, Michelle Yarwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(Keller, James)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/2/2020. (caw)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Karen Feldbaum, Pennsylvania State University, Brendan Prawdzik, Michelle Yarwood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keller, James)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Karen Feldbaum, Pennsylvania State University, Brendan Prawdzik, Michelle Yarwood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keller, James)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Andrea Brockway. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/23/2020. (lg)
March 23, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: verified PA and NJ bar record of Attorney Andrea Brockway. (lg)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Andrea P Brockway on behalf of Karen Feldbaum, Pennsylvania State University, Brendan Prawdzik, Michelle Yarwood Attorney Andrea Brockway is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5041829.. (Brockway, Andrea)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the University shall have until 3/23/2020 to respond to Plaintiff Kayla Williams' Complaint. For clarity, all Defendants will have the same response deadline of 3/23/2020. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/11/20. (jr)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to ComplaintUntil March 23, 2020 by Karen Feldbaum, Pennsylvania State University, Brendan Prawdzik, Michelle Yarwood.(Keller, James)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Keller on behalf of All Defendants (Keller, James)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kayla Williams as to Karen Feldbaum, Brendan Prawdzik, Michelle Yarwood. (Harris, Martell)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/20/2020. (jr)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kayla Williams. Pennsylvania State University served on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Harris, Martell)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5013617), filed by Kayla Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Pennsylvania State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania State University
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrea P Brockway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Yarwood
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrea P Brockway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Prawdzik
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrea P Brockway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Feldbaum
Represented By: James A. Keller
Represented By: Andrea P Brockway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Williams
Represented By: Nelson D Berardinelli
Represented By: Martell Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?