Pneu-Dart, Inc. v. General Star Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Pneu-Dart, Inc.
Defendant: General Star Management Company
Counter Plaintiff: General Star Indemnity Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00497
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 23 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Emily S. Hart. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/19/2020. (lg)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK - Following an Initial Case Management conference, the following dates apply to this case: Discovery due by 1/4/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 6/1/2021. Defendant Expert Report is due by 7/1/2021. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 7/29/2021. Pretrial Memos due by 8/12/2021. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 8/31/2021 in Chambers before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. Case placed on October 2021 trial term. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/18/2020. (jr)
May 18, 2020 Filing 20 Supplement by Pneu-Dart, Inc.. to #17 Brief in Support Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Supplement No. 1, #2 Supplement No. 2, #3 Supplement No. 3)(Griest, Brandon)
May 18, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified D.C. bar record of Attorney Emily S. Hart. (lg)
May 18, 2020 Filing 19 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Emily S Hart on behalf of General Star Indemnity Company Attorney Emily Hart is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5095870.. (Hart, Emily)
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 EXHIBIT Exhibits to Amended Answer and Counterclaim by General Star Indemnity Company re #15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 8)(Duffield, Cara)
May 15, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pneu-Dart, Inc..(Griest, Brandon)
May 15, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Pneu-Dart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Griest, Brandon)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 Amended ANSWER to Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Pneu-Dart, Inc. by General Star Indemnity Company.(Duffield, Cara)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint Case Management Plan by Pneu-Dart, Inc.. (Griest, Brandon)
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Cara Tseng Duffield. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/11/2020. (lg)
May 8, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified DC bar record of Attorney Cara Tseng Duffield. (lg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Cara Tseng Duffield on behalf of General Star Indemnity Company Attorney Cara Duffield is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5088448.. (Duffield, Cara)
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Pneu-Dart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griest, Brandon)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 5/18/2020 at 4:00 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/20/2020. (jr)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Pneu-Dart, Inc. by General Star Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8)(Miller, Alan)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #6 Motion to Amend/Correct Caption is granted. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/3/2020 (lg)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneu-Dart, Inc.. (Griest, Brandon)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption and Substitute Correct Name of Defendant by Pneu-Dart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griest, Brandon)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before 4/17/2020.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/2/2020. (caw)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by General Star Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Alan)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/30/2020. (jr)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by General Star Management Company identifying Corporate Parent General Star Management Company is a wholly-owned subsidiary of General Reinsurance Corporation. General Re Corporation is the parent corporation of General Reinsurance Corporation. Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. is the parent corporation of General Re Corporation and owns more than 10% of General Star Management Company. for General Star Management Company. (Miller, Alan)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Star Management Company from Lycoming County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20-0440. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5047317), filed by General Star Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "Complaint", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pneu-Dart, Inc. v. General Star Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pneu-Dart, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon R Griest
Represented By: Thomas C. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Star Management Company
Represented By: Alan S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: General Star Indemnity Company
Represented By: Alan S. Miller
Represented By: Emily S Hart
Represented By: Cara Tseng Duffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?