Frye v. Sabatini, D.M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Forrer Frye
Defendant: Sabatini Dental Spa, Dominic Sabatini, D.M.D. and Total Health Dentistry, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00593
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Total Health Dentistry, LLC. Total Health Dentistry, LLC waiver sent on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Mongiello, Michael)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Mongiello on behalf of Total Health Dentistry, LLC. (Mongiello, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dominic Sabatini, D.M.D..(Gross, Laurence)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurence I Gross on behalf of Dominic Sabatini, D.M.D.. (Gross, Laurence)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/9/2020. (jr)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sabatini Dental Spa, Dominic Sabatini, D.M.D., Total Health Dentistry, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sabatini Dental Spa, Dominic Sabatini, D.M.D., Total Health Dentistry, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5059007), filed by Kimberly Forrer Frye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A,B, & C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frye v. Sabatini, D.M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabatini Dental Spa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Sabatini, D.M.D.
Represented By: Laurence I Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Health Dentistry, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Mongiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Forrer Frye
Represented By: Richard H. Wix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?