Thomson v. The Pennsylvania State University et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Thomson
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of The Pennsylvania State University and The Pennsylvania State University
Case Number: 4:2020cv00725
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Tyler Thomson. All Defendants. (Willey, Roy)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Roy Willey IV. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/27/2020. (lg)
May 27, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified SC bar record of Attorney Roy Willey IV. (lg)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Roy T Willey, IV on behalf of Tyler Thomson Attorney Roy Willey IV is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5103148.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Willey, Roy)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Eric M. Poulin. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/26/2020. (lg)
May 26, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified all listed state bar records of Attorney Eric Poulin. (lg)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Eric M Poulin on behalf of Tyler Thomson Attorney Eric Poulin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5102615.. (Poulin, Eric)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/1/2020. (jr)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Board of Trustees of The Pennsylvania State University, The Pennsylvania State University and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Board of Trustees of The Pennsylvania State University, The Pennsylvania State University ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5080620), filed by Tyler Thomson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomson v. The Pennsylvania State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Thomson
Represented By: Roy T. Willey
Represented By: Stuart A. Carpey
Represented By: Eric M. Poulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of The Pennsylvania State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pennsylvania State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?