Kilikpo v. Doll et al
Petitioner: Saye N. Kilikpo
Respondent: Matthew Albence, Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf and Clair Doll
Case Number: 4:2020cv00902
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Kilikpo's #1 28 U.S.C. 2241 petition is DENIED; and the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/29/2020. (jr)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Saye N. Kilikpo. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/29/2020. (jr)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE by Matthew Albence, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Habeas Corpus Served on US Attorney (mfa)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Respondents shall file a response to Kilikpo's 2241 petition no later than Thursday, June 11, 2020. In that response, Respondents shall show cause, if there is any, as to why the requested relief should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 6/11/2020.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/4/2020. (lg)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 EMERGENCY PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5, Receipt Number 0314-5110375), filed by Saye N. Kilikpo.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilikpo v. Doll et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saye N. Kilikpo
Represented By: Gerald S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?