BRICKER v. TRAXXAS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: Brian Bricker
Defendant: HRP Distributing Inc., Wheels Of Williamsport, Inc. and Traxxas Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv01286
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-02922 containing electronic documents.
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO USDC MDPA. THE DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE THE FILE IS RECEIVED AND DOCKETED BY THE MIDDLE DISTRICT TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED THAT ANY REFERENCES TO AN ALLEGED FAILURE OF THE DEFENDANTS TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL, STATE AND FEDERAL CODES, REGULATIONS, ORDINANCES, STANDARDS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PARAGRAPH 21(H) ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED THAT ALL REFERENCES TO RECKLESSNESS ARE DISMISSED FROM THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED THAT ALL RULE 12 MOTIONS ARE WITHDRAWN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 7/24/20. 7/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #8 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's Complaint, #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BRIAN BRICKER. (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 7/23/2020 (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's Complaint filed by WHEELS OF WILLIAMSPORT, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(BENEDETTO, CONRAD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by HRP DISTRIBUTING INC..Memorandum/Certificate of Service.(CHAPMAN, THOMAS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TRAXXAS CORPORATION.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(TALARICO, ALYSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by OLIVER RAYMOND BROOKS on behalf of TRAXXAS CORPORATION with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BROOKS, OLIVER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSA R. TALARICO on behalf of TRAXXAS CORPORATION with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(TALARICO, ALYSA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA BAXTER on behalf of TRAXXAS CORPORATION with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BAXTER, PATRICIA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by HRP DISTRIBUTING INC.(SEE PAPER #2 FOR PDF)(md, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HRP DISTRIBUTING INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, Case No. 200501672. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14362226)(md, ) Modified on 6/18/2020 (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure by HRP DISTRIBUTING INC..(CHAPMAN, THOMAS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRICKER v. TRAXXAS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Bricker
Represented By: Joseph L McGlynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRP Distributing Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Justin Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheels Of Williamsport, Inc.
Represented By: Philip D. Priore
Represented By: Conrad James Benedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traxxas Corporation
Represented By: Patricia Baxter
Represented By: Oliver Raymond Brooks
Represented By: Alysa R. Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?