Tomlinson v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Kerol Tomlinson
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund, William Barr, Chad Wolf and Warden Clair Doll
Case Number: 4:2020cv01369
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 TRAVERSE/Reply by Kerol Tomlinson to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed), #8 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(lg)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Supplement by Kerol Tomlinson to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed). (lg)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 TRAVERSE by Kerol Tomlinson to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed), #8 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus. (lg)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Clair Doll by Clair Doll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Habeas Corpus Served on US Attorney (mw)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that because the fee has been paid, #1 Petition is now deemed filed; Clerk directed to terminate Bar, Flores-Lund and Wolf as Respondents; Clerk directed to serve a copy of the petition and this order on Respondent Doll and the US Attorney; #2 Motion to Expedite is granted; Show Cause Response due by 9/8/2020. Chad Wolf (Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security), William Barr (United States Attorney General) and Simona Flores-Lund (U.S. ICE Field Office Director for the Philadelphia District) terminated. (See order for further/complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 9/1/2020. (lg)
August 28, 2020 Receipt of payment from KEROL TOMLINSON in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 8/27/2020. Receipt number 111025919 processed by aarlidge. (jjs)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to Petitioner from Judge Arbuckle. (caw)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/04/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (lp)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite petition filed by Kerol Tomlinson.(lp)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Kerol Tomlinson.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomlinson v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kerol Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?