Paul v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Verma Sat Paul
Respondent: William Barr, Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf and Warden Clair Doll
Case Number: 4:2020cv01370
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that: 1. This action is dismissed without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court shall close this file. 2. The Clerk of Court is further directed to TERMINATE all pending motions (Doc. 2). See Order for further details.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/10/20. (dmn)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Mail sent #3 to Verma Sat Paul. Returned as Undeliverable - Unable to Forward. (kpf)
September 10, 2020 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING Case reassigned to Honorable Yvette Kane for all further proceedings. (jkc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUGGESTION OF MOOTNESS Upon the Record as to Petition due to Removal from United States by William Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf. (Sanderson, Joanne)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 8/6/2020 Letter sent to Verma Sat Paul. Envelope states Return to Sender. (nr)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Mail sent #4 to Verma Sat Paul. Returned as Undeliverable - Unable to Forward. (kpf)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to Petitioner from Judge Arbuckle. (caw)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/04/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (lp)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite petition filed by Verma Sat Paul.(lp)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Verma Sat Paul.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Verma Sat Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?