Valenti v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Vera Valenti
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 4:2020cv01423
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America.. (Oslick, Jacob)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint With Certificate of Service by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Oslick, Jacob)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Vera Valenti. The Prudential Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 8/13/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Chaban, Lawrence)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Lawrence Chaban. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/13/2020. (lg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Lawrence R. Chaban on behalf of Vera Valenti Attorney Lawrence Chaban is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5206039.. (Chaban, Lawrence)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/13/2020. (jr)
August 13, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney Lawrence R. Chaban and associate counsel Tybe Ann Brett. (lg)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5202319), filed by Vera Valenti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valenti v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jacob FM Oslick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vera Valenti
Represented By: Lawrence R. Chaban
Represented By: Tybe A. Brett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?