BRZOSKA V. WAL-MART STORES, ETAL
Plaintiff: Steve Brzoska
Defendant: Walmart Inc. and WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. a/k/a WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP a/k/a WAL-MART STORES, INC.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01904
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. McDonnell on behalf of WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. a/k/a WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP a/k/a WAL-MART STORES, INC., Walmart Inc.. (McDonnell, Patrick)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 Case transferred electronically in from Eastern District of Pennsylvania Case Number 2:20-cv-04200 containing electronic documents. (lg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STEVE BRZOSKA. (MAGGIO, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE THIS CASE IN THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/8/20. 9/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Memorandum of Law in Support of Transfer to United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania by WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. a/k/a WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP a/k/a WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART, INC.. (LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN)[Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER COUNSEL ARE EACH GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDA NOT EXCEEDING SEVEN PAGES ON OR BEFORE 9/4/2020 AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 8/31/2020. 8/31/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ka, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Walmart, Inc. by WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. a/k/a WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP a/k/a WAL-MART STORES, INC..(LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. a/k/a WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP a/k/a WAL-MART STORES, INC..(LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WALMART, INC..(LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. a/k/a WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP a/k/a WAL-MART STORES, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14523233), filed by WALMART, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. a/k/a WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP a/k/a WAL-MART STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Designation Form, #10 Appendix I)(LIGHTFOOT, LAQUAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRZOSKA V. WAL-MART STORES, ETAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Laquan T Lightfoot
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. a/k/a WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP a/k/a WAL-MART STORES, INC.
Represented By: Laquan T Lightfoot
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Brzoska
Represented By: Brian M. Maggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?