Guerra v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Marco Tulio Arana Guerra
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf, Warden Clair Doll and William P. Barr
Case Number: 4:2020cv01986
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 TRAVERSE by Marco Tulio Arana Guerra to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed), #7 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus. (ga)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by William P. Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf by William P. Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of Order and Petition for Habeas Executed on US Attny's Office. (aaa)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED THAT because the fee has been paid, #1 Petition is now deemed filed; Clerk directed to terminate Barr, Flores-Lund and Wolf as respondents; Clerk directed to serve the Petition and this Order on Respondent and US Attorney; #2 Motion to Expedite is granted. Chad Wolf (Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security), William Barr (United States Attorney General ) and Simona Flores-Lund (ICE Field Office Director for the Philadelphia District) terminated. Expedited Response due by 11/11/2020. (See order for further/complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 11/4/2020. (lg)
November 3, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case is now DEEMED filed. (ga)
October 30, 2020 Receipt of payment from MARCO TULIO ARANA GUERRA in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 10/30/2020. Receipt number 333073586 processed by gangeli. (jjs)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (lg)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. (Attachment: #1 IFP Form)(lg)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite by Marco Tulio Arana Guerra, pro se.(lg)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Marco Tulio Arana Guerra, pro se.(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerra v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marco Tulio Arana Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?