Rixtun-Cabrera v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Armando Rixtun-Cabrera
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf, William P. Barr and Warden Clair Doll
Case Number: 4:2020cv02070
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 TRAVERSE by Armando Rixtun-Cabrera to #8 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed). (ga)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Clair Doll by Clair Doll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Habeas Corpus Served on US Attorney (mw)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED THAT because the fee has been paid, #1 Petition is now deemed filed; Clerk directed to terminate Barr, Flores-Lund and Wolf as respondents; Clerk directed to serve the Petition and this Order on Respondent and US Attorney; #2 Petitioner's Motion to Expedite is granted. Chad Wolf (Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security), William Barr (United States Attorney General ) and Simona Flores-Lund (ICE Field Office Director for the Philadelphia District) terminated. Expedited Response due by 11/25/2020. (Please see order for further/complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 11/18/2020. (lg)
November 16, 2020 Receipt of payment from ARMANDO RIXTUN CABRERA in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 11/13/2020. Receipt number 333073742 processed by aoswald. (jjs)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333073742. Petition is now deemed FILED. (ga)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (lg)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. (Attachment: #1 IFP Form)(lg)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite by Armando Rixtun-Cabrera, pro se.(lg)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Armando Rixtun-Cabrera, pro se.(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rixtun-Cabrera v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Armando Rixtun-Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?