BROWNT v. POTLURI et al
Plaintiff: Allant B Brownt
Defendant: Prakash L. Potluri and Maria C. Santos Ignacio
Case Number: 4:2020cv02365
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Maria C. Santos Ignacio, Prakash L. Potluri. Prakash L. Potluri waiver sent on 2/8/2021, answer due 4/9/2021; Allant B Brownt waiver sent on 2/8/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Harlow, Jessica)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L Harlow on behalf of Maria C. Santos Ignacio, Prakash L. Potluri (Harlow, Jessica)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/8/2021. (jr)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-06142 containing electronic documents.
December 16, 2020 Original record transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania via interdistrict transfer system. (md, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
December 16, 2020 PAPER #4 MAILED TO UNREPS (JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO USDC MDPA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/14/20. 12/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) UNREPS NOT MAILED. (va, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ALLANT B BROWNT. (KAPNER, KENNETH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
December 9, 2020 Summons Issued as to PRAKASH L. POTLURI and MARIA C. SANTOS IGNACIO. E-mailed to counsel on 12/9/20 (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF ALLANT B. BROWNT SHALL SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING SEVEN PAGES FILED ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 14, 2020 AS TO WHY WE SHOULD NOT TRANSFER THIS CASE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404, 1406 TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR EITHER THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA OR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 12/8/20. 12/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, ) Modified on 12/8/2020 (va, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRAKASH L. POTLURI, MARIA C. SANTOS IGNACIO ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14760326.), filed by ALLANT B BROWNT.(KAPNER, KENNETH) Modified on 12/7/2020 (md, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/7/2020) (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWNT v. POTLURI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prakash L. Potluri
Represented By: Jessica L Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria C. Santos Ignacio
Represented By: Jessica L Harlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allant B Brownt
Represented By: Kenneth M. Kapner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?