OWLFEATHER-GORBEY v. BIDEN et al
Plaintiff: Chief Michael S Owlfeather-Gorbey and Michael S Owlfeather-Gorbey
Defendant: Black Lives Matter Organization, Unknown Named Governor Of Pennsylvania, Pa Voters & Election Administration, Vice President Joe Biden, C. Harris, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and Josh Shapiro
Case Number: 4:2021cv00131
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Plaintiff shall pay $402 filing and administrative fees in full within 30 days of date of Order or dismissal of action will be recommended; granting #10 Motion for Leave to supplement the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/25/21 (ms)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael S Owlfeather-Gorbey, #10 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Michael S Owlfeather-Gorbey Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 2/25/21. (ms)
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Michael S Owlfeather-Gorbey.(ga)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Add Additional Argumenets & New Evidence to Support Imminent Danger by Michael S Owlfeather-Gorbey.(ga)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Plaintiff; (address label on envelope and search of BOP Inmate Locator show Plaintiff is at FCI Beckley; address updated; pro se letter and attachments remailed. (lg)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Warden to provide copy of plaintiff's inmate account within 15 days of date of Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/26/21. (ms)(Copy to Warden from Chambers)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Prisoner Instructions for Filing a Complaint, #2 Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules) (nr)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael S Owlfeather-Gorbey.(nr)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Joe Biden, Black Lives Matter Organization, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, C. Harris, Pa Voters & Election Administration, Josh Shapiro, Unknown Named Governor Of Pennsylvania lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael S Owlfeather-Gorbey. (Attachments: #1 Doccument in Support of Complaint, #2 Envelope)(nr)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-01968 containing electronic documents.
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER indicating that for the reasons stated the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER THIS CASE to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. A ruling on Plaintiff's in forma pauperis motion shall be deferred to the transferee court. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/21/2020. (bsc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/25/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by MICHAEL S. OWLFEATHER-GORBEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/25/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL S. OWLFEATHER-GORBEY. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Envelope) (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 1/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWLFEATHER-GORBEY v. BIDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Lives Matter Organization
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Named Governor Of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pa Voters & Election Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice President Joe Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chief Michael S Owlfeather-Gorbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S Owlfeather-Gorbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?