Kershner v. Spencer Gifts, LLC
Plaintiff: Harrington W. Kershner, IV
Defendant: Spencer Gifts, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00623
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Jill Peet on behalf of Spencer Gifts, LLC (Peet, Stephanie)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Harrington W. Kershner, IV. Spencer Gifts, LLC waiver sent on 4/6/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Karpf, Ari)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/6/2021. (jr)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Spencer Gifts, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Spencer Gifts,( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5534671), LLC, filed by Harrington W. Kershner, IV. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kershner v. Spencer Gifts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrington W. Kershner, IV
Represented By: Ari R. Karpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Gifts, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Jill Peet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?