Zhou v. Lu, et al
Plaintiff: Zhiqiong Zhou
Defendant: Mrs. Yang Lu, Yang Lu and Wei Yu
Not Classified By Court: Mediator
Case Number: 4:2021cv00682
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Referring Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint by Zhiqiong Zhou. (Chen, Jesse)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Joseph Anthony Barrett for Mediator added. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 6/4/2021. (caw)
June 3, 2021 Filing 15 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial re Counts 3 and 8) filed by Zhiqiong Zhou. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Jesse)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2021 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle. This conference will be held by telephone. Counsel are instructed to call the conference line number at 1-877-336-1829, Access Code: 6319086#. The completed Joint Case Management Plan (a sample of which is set forth in Appendix A of the local rules), must be e-filed with the court at least seven (7) business days prior to the case management conference. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 5/24/2021. (caw)
May 20, 2021 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial re Counts 3 and 8) filed by Yang Lu, Wei Yu. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s) Gerhart, #2 Unpublished Opinion(s) Mavrinac)(Greenland, Madison)
May 20, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial re Counts 3 and 8) by Yang Lu, Wei Yu. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Greenland, Madison)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Approved. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Arbuckle. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/17/2021. (jr)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ELECTION by Zhiqiong Zhou and Defendants of Referral to Magistrate Judge. (Chen, Jesse)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 Praecipe to Amend Caption-Add Wife's Name . (Greenland, Madison)
May 13, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Defendant Wei Yu substituted for Mrs. Yang Lu. (lg)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants' Yang Lu and Wei Yu shall have until 5/20/2021 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/10/2021. (jr)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Yang Lu(et ux), Yang Lu. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Greenland, Madison)
May 4, 2021 SUMMONS Returned Executed date added: Defendants served on 4/15/2021, answers due 5/6/2021. (lg)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mr. Yang Lu, Mrs. Yang Lu on 04/15/2021, filed by Zhiqiong Zhou. (Chen, Jesse)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Madison V. Greenland on behalf of All Defendants (Greenland, Madison)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/15/2021. (jr)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mrs. Yang Lu and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s) in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Yang Lu et ux and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s) in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yang Lu et ux ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5543097), filed by Zhiqiong Zhou. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lg)
April 13, 2021 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Attorney Jesse Chen. (lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhou v. Lu, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Yang Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Lu
Represented By: Madison V. Greenland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wei Yu
Represented By: Madison V. Greenland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhiqiong Zhou
Represented By: Jesse Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mediator
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?