Hart v. Government Employees Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Susan Olivia Hart
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company d/b/a Geico
Case Number: 4:2021cv00859
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 12 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Gregg Greenberg. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/14/2021. (lg)
June 14, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified MD, VA and DC bar records of Attorney Gregg Greenberg. (lg)
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Gregg C Greenberg on behalf of Susan Olivia Hart Attorney Gregg Greenberg is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5604971.. (Greenberg, Gregg)
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Olivia Hart. Government Employees Insurance Company served on 5/14/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Nahass, Zachary)
June 4, 2021 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Teresa Teare. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/4/2021. (lg)
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Eric Hemmendinger. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/4/2021. (lg)
June 4, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Teresa D. Teare on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company Attorney Teresa Teare is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number BPAMDC-5596617.. (Teare, Teresa)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Eric Hemmendinger on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company Attorney Eric Hemmendinger is seeking special admission.. (Hemmendinger, Eric)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Government Employees Insurance Company.(Williams, Steven)
June 4, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified Maryland bar records of Attorney Eric Hemmendinger and Attorney Teresa Teare. (lg)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Williams on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Company. (Williams, Steven)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/12/2021. (jr)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Government Employees Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Government Employees Insurance Company ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5573714), filed by Susan Olivia Hart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Government Employees Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company d/b/a Geico
Represented By: Steven M. Williams
Represented By: Eric Hemmendinger
Represented By: Teresa D. Teare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Olivia Hart
Represented By: Zachary E Nahass
Represented By: Gregg C Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?