Pagan Mercado v. Saul
Plaintiff: Glorializ M Pagan Mercado
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2021cv01213
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glorializ M Pagan Mercado Attorney General of the United States (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Return Receipt Card)(Schibinger, Jason)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glorializ M Pagan Mercado United States Attorneys Office - Harrisburg, PA (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Return Receipt Card)(Schibinger, Jason)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glorializ M Pagan Mercado Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region III (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Return Receipt Card)(Schibinger, Jason)
August 30, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glorializ M Pagan Mercado General Counsel, Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Return Receipt Card)(Schibinger, Jason)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re PROOF OF SERVICE - it is ORDERED that: Plaintiff is required to provide proof of service, as required by Fed. R.Civ. P. 4(l) and LR 4.1 on or before 9/9/2021. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 8/25/2021.(caw)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Arbuckle in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Parties YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 8/18/2021. (caw)
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Craig Black on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Black, Bryan)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals.(nr)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5630642), filed by Glorializ M Pagan Mercado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pagan Mercado v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glorializ M Pagan Mercado
Represented By: Jason J. Schibinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Bryan Craig Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?