Buskirk v. Wirth
Plaintiff: Grace Van Buskirk
Defendant: Mary E. Wirth
Case Number: 4:2021cv01358
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/18/2021 at 3:30 PM before Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 9/21/2021. (jr)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Mary E. Wirth.(Dorer, Donald)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald R. Dorer on behalf of Mary E. Wirth. (Dorer, Donald)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/4/2021. (jr)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mary E. Wirth and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary E. Wirth ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5657914), filed by Grace Van Buskirk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buskirk v. Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Van Buskirk
Represented By: Ryan R. Jablonski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary E. Wirth
Represented By: Donald R. Dorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?