Groninger v. Mavretic et al
Plaintiff: Kayleigh A. Groninger
Defendant: David B. Mavretic and Evans Delivery Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv01364
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Evans Delivery Company identifying Corporate Parent ENC Acquisition Corp for Evans Delivery Company. (Peters, Tiffany)
October 4, 2021 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE REPORT by Evans Delivery Company, David B. Mavretic by Evans Delivery Company, David B. Mavretic.(Peters, Tiffany)
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE REPORT. (Sutton, James)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint by Kayleigh A. Groninger. (Sutton, James)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/5/2021 at 4:00 PM before Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 9/21/2021. (jr)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures/ (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 9/10/2021. (jr)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Kayleigh A. Groninger to #7 Answer to Complaint Plaintiff's Answers to Affirmative Defenses of Defendants. (Sutton, James)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany M. Peters on behalf of All Defendants. (Peters, Tiffany)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Evans Delivery Company, David B. Mavretic.(Peters, Tiffany)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kayleigh A. Groninger Acceptance of Service on Behalf of Def David B Mavretic (Sutton, James)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-03037 containing electronic documents. (nr)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THIS CASE SHALL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. UPON TRANSFER TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT, PLAINTIFF SHALL FORWARD AN ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MAVRETIC. DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER IS HEREBY DISMISSED AS MOOT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/5/21. 8/5/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/6/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION re #2 First MOTION to Dismiss DUE TO IMPROPER VENUE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(3) AND MOTION IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S. C. 1404 Stipulation To Transfer with Proposed Order by Kayleigh A. Groninger. (SUTTON, JAMES) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/6/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION to Dismiss DUE TO IMPROPER VENUE UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(3) AND MOTION IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S. C. 1404 filed by EVANS DELIVERY COMPANY, David B. Mavretic.Brief, Affidavit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss, #3 Text of Proposed Order Alternate Proposed Order to Transfer, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Mavretic, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A)(PETERS, TIFFANY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/6/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Summons Issued as to EVANS DELIVERY COMPANY, David B. Mavretic. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/9/21 (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/6/2021.]
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15240005.), filed by Kayleigh A. Groninger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Complaint Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form for Complaint)(SUTTON, JAMES) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/6/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groninger v. Mavretic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayleigh A. Groninger
Represented By: James W. Sutton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Mavretic
Represented By: Tiffany Marie Peters
Represented By: Douglas B. Marcello
Represented By: Tiffany M. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans Delivery Company
Represented By: Tiffany Marie Peters
Represented By: Douglas B. Marcello
Represented By: Tiffany M. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?