Glime v. Susquehanna Valley Pre-Owned Sales & Service et al
Plaintiff: Eric Glime
Defendant: Susquehanna Valley Pre-Owned Sales & Service and Justin Valentine
Case Number: 4:2021cv01499
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1989
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-02257 containing electronic documents.
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. && 1404 AND 1406(a) IS GRANTED AND THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THIS LAWSUIT TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 8/31/21. 8/31/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/31/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 8/31/21. 8/31/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/31/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Original record together with certified copy of docket entries forwarded TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. (JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/31/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Joint MOTION Change of Venue filed by Susquehanna Valley Pre-Owned Sales & Service, JUSTIN VALENTINE.Uncontested Motion for Change of Venue. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(ORSO, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/31/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 8/3/2021 AT 11:30 A.M., ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 7/22/21. 7/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/31/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH F. ORSO, III on behalf of Susquehanna Valley Pre-Owned Sales & Service, JUSTIN VALENTINE (ORSO, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/31/2021.]
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15129606.), filed by Eric Glime. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Case Management Track Form, #7 Designation Form)(FILIPOVIC, PREDRAG) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/31/2021.]
May 18, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Eric Glime. (fb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/31/2021.]
May 18, 2021 Summons Issued as to Susquehanna Valley Pre-Owned Sales & Service, JUSTIN VALENTINE. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 5/18/21 (JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/31/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glime v. Susquehanna Valley Pre-Owned Sales & Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Glime
Represented By: Predrag Filipovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susquehanna Valley Pre-Owned Sales & Service
Represented By: Joseph F. Orso, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Valentine
Represented By: Joseph F. Orso, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?