Brown v. Madison Court Apartment
Plaintiff: Carol Brown
Defendant: Madison Court Apartment
Case Number: 4:2021cv01897
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. (nr)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (nr)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred electronically in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-08816 containing electronic documents.
November 1, 2021 Mailed a copy of #4 Order to Carol Brown at 747 Concourse Village West, #6B, Bronx, NY 10451. (kh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/8/2021.]
November 1, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/8/2021.]
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/29/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/8/2021.]
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/29/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/8/2021.]
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Madison Court Apartment. Document filed by Carol Brown. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/8/2021.]
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Carol Brown. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Madison Court Apartment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Court Apartment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?