Hill v. Perry
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Hill
Defendant: Scott Perry
Case Number: 4:2022cv00560
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Referring Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL in NON-PRISONER Case [ 5] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Jeffrey D. Hill. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. Filing fee $ 505 The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (nr)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffrey D. Hill, #1 Complaint in Mandamus filed by Jeffrey D. Hill - it is RECOMMENDED that: (1) Plaintiff's IFP motion (Doc. 2) be granted and this case should be dismissed without leave to amend pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) (failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted). (2) If appropriate, refer this matter to me to conduct appropriate sanction proceedings and to recommend an appropriate sanction that would prohibit Plaintiff from filing future federal quo warranto claims and any future mandamus claims about elections without counsel or payment of the full civil filing fee, or the in alternative, simply close this case. Objections to R&R due by 5/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 4/26/2022. (caw)
April 26, 2022 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann and referred to Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (lg)
April 18, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Jeffrey David Hill of address for Scott Perry. (lg)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffrey David Hill, pro se.(lg)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - petition for disqualification from ballot and public office - Writ of Quo Warranto/Prohibition/Mandamus against Scott Perry, filed by Jeffrey David Hill, pro se.(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?