Hill v. Saccone
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Hill
Defendant: Rick Saccone
Case Number: 4:2022cv00689
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Referring Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL in NON PRISONER Case re [ 4] Report and Recommendation by Jeffrey D. Hill. Filing Fee and Docket Fee not paid. Filing fee $ 505. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (lg)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffrey D. Hill, #1 Complaint filed by Jeffrey D. Hill - it is RECOMMENDED that: (1) Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 2) be GRANTED, and the case be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) without leave to amend. (2) The Clerk of Court be DIRECTED to close this case. Objections to R&R due by 6/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 6/3/2022. (caw)
June 3, 2022 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann and referred to Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc)
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (lg)
May 10, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffrey D. Hill, pro se.(lg)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - petition for disqualification from ballot against Rick Saccone, filed by Jeffrey D. Hill, pro se.(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Saccone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Saccone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?