Nothstein v. Wilkes-Barre VA Medical Center
Plaintiff: Robert Nothstein
Defendant: Wilkes-Barre VA Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2022cv00827
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. A Notice of Voluntary Dismissal shall be filed on or before 8/29/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 7/1/2022. (jr)
June 30, 2022 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Wilkes-Barre VA Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Judge, Timothy)
June 30, 2022 Filing 2 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 6/30/2022. (jr)
May 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wilkes-Barre VA Medical Center from Lycoming County Magisterial District Court, case number 2022MJ37. ( Filing fee $ 402 ), filed by Wilkes-Barre VA Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nothstein v. Wilkes-Barre VA Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilkes-Barre VA Medical Center
Represented By: Timothy S. Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?