TSHUDY v. PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY
Plaintiff: Trisha Tshudy
Defendant: Pennsylvania State University
Case Number: 4:2022cv01431
Filed: September 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Filing 39 Letter from Geoffrey Sasso . (Sasso, Geoffrey)
November 8, 2022 Filing 38 Letter from William C. Reil . (Reil, William)
October 10, 2022 Filing 37 REPLY BRIEF re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pennsylvania State University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Sasso, Geoffrey)
October 6, 2022 Filing 36 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Geoffrey F. Sasso. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 10/6/2022. (jr)
October 4, 2022 Filing 35 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Geoffrey F Sasso on behalf of Pennsylvania State University Attorney Geoffrey F. Sasso is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6078575.. (Sasso, Geoffrey)
September 27, 2022 Filing 34 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Trisha Tshudy.(Reil, William)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 9/16/2022 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 9/15/2022. (jr)
September 15, 2022 Filing 31 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 9/15/2022. (jr)
September 14, 2022 Filing 30 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pennsylvania State University.(nr)
September 14, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Pennsylvania State University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(nr)
September 14, 2022 Filing 28 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Pennsylvania State University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Part 1), #5 Exhibit 4 (Part 2), #6 Exhibit 4 (Part 3), #7 Exhibit 4 (Part 4), #8 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), #9 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), #10 Exhibit 5 (Part 3), #11 Exhibit 5 (Part 4))(nr)
September 14, 2022 Filing 27 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Trisha Tshudy.(nr)
September 14, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Trisha Tshudy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(nr) (Main Document 26 replaced on 9/14/2022) (nr).
September 14, 2022 Filing 25 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-03336 containing electronic documents.
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/13/22. 9/13/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 13, 2022 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/13/22. 9/13/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 12, 2022 Filing 22 Discovery Plan by TRISHA TSHUDY.(REIL, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 12, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Transfer filed by TRISHA TSHUDY. (REIL, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 9, 2022 Filing 20 Discovery Plan by PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY.(SASSO, GEOFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 9, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Part 1), #5 Exhibit 4 (Part 2), #6 Exhibit 4 (Part 3), #7 Exhibit 4 (Part 4), #8 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), #9 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), #10 Exhibit 5 (Part 3), #11 Exhibit 5 (part 4))(SASSO, GEOFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 6, 2022 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET Pretrial Conference held on 9/6/22. (JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE NO LATER THAN 9/12/22. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/6/22. 9/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR 9/14/22 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 10-A; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/6/22. 9/6/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 2, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE: A settlement conference via the internet will be held on September 29, 2022 at 10:00 a.m., before the Honorable Richard A. Lloret, United States Magistrate Judge. Please email all participants names and emails to sheila_mccurry@paed.uscourts.gov by September 22, 2022. The ZOOM log-on information will be emailed prior to the conference. A status telephone call will be held on September 6, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. Defense counsel will initiate the call to Judge Llorets cell phone once all counsel are on the line. Judge Llorets cell phone number was provided via email. Please complete the attached summary and e-mail it to Chambers at sheila_mccurry@paed.uscourts.gov on or before September 22, 2022. If it is NOT emailed by then Judge Lloret may CANCEL the settlement conference.(smcc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 2, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/14/2022 AT 3:00 PM BY Video Conference BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report Rule 26(f), #2 Zoom Info Template)(nm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 2, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SASSO, GEOFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR 9/7/22 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 10-A BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/1/22. 9/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES ARE REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD LLORET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ON OR BEFORE 9/2/22, COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES SHALL CONTACT UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD LLORET TO SCHEDULE A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/1/22. 9/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
August 30, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TRISHA TSHUDY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(REIL, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT/PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/26/22.8/26/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
August 26, 2022 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. Video Conference held on 8/26/22. (mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
August 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Lucas Hamilton on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(Hamilton, Erin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
August 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE C. MORRISON on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(MORRISON, GEORGE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
August 24, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by GEOFFREY F. SASSO on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(SASSO, GEOFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
August 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ZOOM STATUS CONFERENCE ON MOTION FOR PRLIMINARY INJUNCTION - SET FOR FRIDAY, AUGUST 26, 2022 AT 10:00 A.M. COUNSEL SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov(lbc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
August 22, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY. Forwarded To: counsel on 8/22/22. (mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
August 22, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TRISHA TSHUDY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(REIL, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]
August 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16121362.), filed by TRISHA TSHUDY.(REIL, WILLIAM) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/22/2022) (sbt). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/14/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TSHUDY v. PENNSYLVANIA STATE UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha Tshudy
Represented By: William C. Reil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania State University
Represented By: Erin Lucas Hamilton
Represented By: Geoffrey F Sasso
Represented By: George C. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?