Brown v. Havens
Plaintiff: Eugene M. Brown
Defendant: Detective Tyson Havens
Case Number: 4:2023cv00878
Filed: May 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tyson Havens, filed by Eugene M. Brown.(nr)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall, if he chooses, file an amended complaint on or before 8/7/2023. Failure to file an amended complaint may result in the dismissal of this case. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 7/7/2023. (caw)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint is DEEMED filed. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), the Court shall conduct a preliminary review of the plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 7/7/2023. (caw)
June 20, 2023 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Eugene M. Brown. (ea)
June 20, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene M. Brown. (ea)
May 30, 2023 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 05/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
May 30, 2023 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. (nr)
May 30, 2023 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (nr)
May 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tyson Havens lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Eugene M. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Tyson Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?