Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 4:2024cv00709
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Subpoena. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 5/8/2024. (ea)
May 7, 2024 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Atkin, John)
May 7, 2024 Filing 6 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Williamson, #2 Declaration of Patrick Paige, #3 Declaration of Susan Stalzer, #4 Proposed Order)(Atkin, John)
May 1, 2024 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 5/1/2024. (jr)
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Atkin, John)
April 25, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Doe and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
April 25, 2024 Filing 2 REPORT to the Register of Copyrights of the filing or determination of a Copyright action. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to AO 121 Form) (nr)
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number 6619581), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Infringement List, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: John C. Atkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?