Doe v. The Pennsylvania State University et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Amber Grove, The Pennsylvania State University and Sarah Kern
Case Number: 4:2024cv02111
Filed: December 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by John Doe. Sarah Kern waiver sent on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Mekilo, Stefanie)
December 17, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by John Doe. Amber Grove waiver sent on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Mekilo, Stefanie)
December 17, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by John Doe. The Pennsylvania State University waiver sent on 12/10/2024, answer due 2/10/2025. (Mekilo, Stefanie)
December 17, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T Simmons on behalf of The Pennsylvania State University, Amber Grove, Sarah Kern (Simmons, Andrew)
December 17, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Pennsylvania State University, Amber Grove, Sarah Kern. (Morrison, George)
December 17, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Morrison on behalf of All Defendants (Morrison, George)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's #3 Motion Leave to Proceed by Pseudonym is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may continue to proceed under the pseudonym "John Doe" in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may omit his county of residence from the Civil Cover Sheet filed contemporaneously with the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the docket and all future papers filed in this litigation shall refer to Plaintiff as "John Doe," and any exhibits or other documents filed by the parties reflecting Plaintiff's name shall be redacted and/or filed under seal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's actual name shall be available to the attorneys of record in this litigation, who shall not disclose or permit disclosure of this name except to their law partners, associates, and persons employed in the law offices of such attorneys. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 12/10/2024. (ea)
December 11, 2024 Filing 7 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 12/11/2024. (jr)
December 10, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed by Pseudonym by Stefanie Pitcavage Mekilo on behalf of John Doe (Mekilo, Stefanie)
December 10, 2024 Filing 5 EXHIBIT E (Thumb Drive containing native files) by John Doe re #1 Complaint. (Thumb drive will be retained in Media Files in Clerk's Office) (nr)
December 9, 2024 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed by Pseudonym filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John Doe, #2 Exhibit B - Doe v. Trs. of Univ. of Pa. Unpublished Order, #3 Exhibit C - Doe v. Pa. State Univ. Unpublished Order) (ea)
December 9, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed by Pseudonym by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (ea)
December 9, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Amber Grove, Sarah Kern, The Pennsylvania State University and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s) in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ea)
December 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amber Grove, Sarah Kern, The Pennsylvania State University (Filing fee $405, Receipt Number 6837001), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 3/26/20 OCR Compliance Review Letter, #3 Exhibit B - 4/18/23 Centre Daily Times Article, #4 Exhibit C - Penn State Title IX Policy, #5 Exhibit D - Penn State 2022 Sexual Misconduct Climate Survey, #6 Exhibit E - Dear Katie Videos (Cover Sheet Only), #7 Exhibit F - OSMRR 2022-2023 Year End Report) (ea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. The Pennsylvania State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Grove
Represented By: George C. Morrison
Represented By: Andrew T Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pennsylvania State University
Represented By: George C. Morrison
Represented By: Andrew T Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Kern
Represented By: George C. Morrison
Represented By: Andrew T Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Stefanie Pitcavage Mekilo
Represented By: Casey Alan Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?