FERGUSON v. DIGUGLIELMO et al
Petitioner: ANTONIO D. FERGUSON
Respondent: DAVID DIGUGLIELMO, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA and DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF ERIE, BRADLEY H. FOULK
Case Number: 1:2009cv00072
Filed: March 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM ORDER dismissing 49 Motion to Vacate; adopting Report and Recommendations re 52 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/21/2019. (kly)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 40 Motion to Reopen Case; adopting Report and Recommendations re 41 Report and Recommendations. A certificate of appealability is denied. The Clerk shall send copies of this Order to the parties. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 9/11/2017. (nk)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation 30 dated 7/9/14and DENYING 29 Motion for Relief of Judgment 29 . A Certificate of Appealability is denied: and Pursuant to Rule 4(a)(1) of the Fed Rules of Appellate Procedure, if any party wishes to appeal from this Order a notice of appeal, as provided in Rule of Appellate Procedure 3, must be filed with the Clerk of Court within 30 daysCase Closed.. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 8/6/14. (rtw)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM ORDER that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED, that the 15 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan is ADOPTED as the Opinion of the Court and that the Clerk of Court mark this case CLOSED. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 8/4/2010. (sjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FERGUSON v. DIGUGLIELMO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTONIO D. FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID DIGUGLIELMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF THE COUNTY OF ERIE, BRADLEY H. FOULK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?